Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
19 Sep 1912 | Born | ||
7 Mar 1937 | 24.4 | Ordained Priest | Priest |
10 Jul 1952 | 39.8 | Appointed | Bishop of Sorsogon, Philippines |
7 Oct 1952 | 40.0 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop of Sorsogon, Philippines |
7 Sep 1959 | 46.9 | Appointed | Coadjutor Archbishop of Caceres (Nueva Caceres), Philippines |
7 Sep 1959 | 46.9 | Appointed | Titular Archbishop of Amastris |
6 Apr 1965 | 52.5 | Succeeded | Archbishop of Caceres (Nueva Caceres), Philippines |
20 Oct 1983 | 71.0 | Resigned | Archbishop of Caceres (Nueva Caceres), Philippines |
2 May 1996 | 83.6 | Died | Archbishop Emeritus of Caceres (Nueva Caceres), Philippines |
(WikiData: Q2239695)
Archbishop
Teopisto Valderrama
Alberto
(born , died )
Archbishop Emeritus
of Caceres (Nueva Caceres)
|
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Bagamanoc |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠