Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
9 Feb 1855 | Born | ||
29 Apr 1877 | 22.2 | Ordained Priest | Priest |
24 Sep 1896 | 41.6 | Appointed | Titular Archbishop of Nazareth per i Maroniti |
24 Sep 1896 | 41.6 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Archbishop of Nazareth per i Maroniti |
11 Feb 1911 | 56.0 | Appointed | Archbishop of Cipro (Maronite) |
30 Jan 1941³ | 85.9 | Resigned | Archbishop of Cipro (Maronite) |
30 Jan 1941³ | 85.9 | Appointed | Titular Archbishop of Chalcis in Syria |
14 Jun 1941 | 86.3 | Appointed | Titular Archbishop of Nazareth |
27 Jun 1942 | 87.3 | Died | Archbishop Emeritus of Cipro (Maronite) |
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Hesrouan |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠