Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
14 Jan 1928 | Born | ||
15 Jul 1958 | 30.5 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Society of Jesus |
1 Dec 1967 | 39.8 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru |
1 Dec 1967 | 39.8 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Sertei |
7 Jan 1968 | 39.9 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Sertei |
2 Jun 1978 | 50.3 | Appointed | Prelate of Chimbote, Peru |
6 Apr 1983 | 55.2 | Appointed | Bishop of Chimbote, Peru |
4 Feb 2004 | 76.0 | Retired | Bishop of Chimbote, Peru |
19 Mar 2021 | 93.1 | Died | Bishop Emeritus of Chimbote, Peru |
(VIAF: 75891895; WikiData: Q1876339)
Bishop
Luis Armando
Bambarén Gastelumendi
S.J.
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus
of Chimbote
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Yungay |
Ordained Bishop | San Martin de Porras, Church, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima |
Death Place | Lima, Archdiocese of Lima |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠