Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
13 Nov 1926 | Born | ||
29 Jun 1951 | 24.6 | Ordained Priest | Priest |
23 Dec 1968 | 42.1 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Nantes, France |
23 Dec 1968 | 42.1 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Tadamata |
6 Jan 1969 | 42.1 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Tadamata |
9 Sep 1975 | 48.8 | Appointed | Coadjutor Archbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France |
9 Sep 1975 | 48.8 | Appointed | Titular Archbishop of Tadamata |
28 Jun 1977 | 50.6 | Succeeded | Archbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France |
21 Dec 1990 | 64.1 | Resigned | Archbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France |
2 Sep 1996 | 69.8 | Died | Archbishop Emeritus of Sens (-Auxerre), France |
(VIAF: 263823432; WikiData: Q27508133)
Archbishop
Eugène-Marie
Ernoult
(born , died )
Archbishop Emeritus
of Sens (-Auxerre)
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Saint-Pol-de-Léon |
Ordained Bishop | San Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 2 Jun 2024 |
✠