Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
1 Jan 1909 | Born | ||
1 Apr 1933 | 24.2 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Medellín, Colombia |
7 Mar 1952 | 43.1 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Antioquía, Colombia |
7 Mar 1952 | 43.1 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Attuda |
27 Apr 1952 | 43.3 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Attuda |
1 Apr 1955 | 46.2 | Appointed | Bishop of Antioquía, Colombia |
28 Jul 1969 | 60.5 | Resigned | Bishop of Antioquía, Colombia |
28 Jul 1969 | 60.5 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Nicives |
22 Jan 1971 | 62.0 | Resigned | Titular Bishop of Nicives |
30 Oct 1986 | 77.8 | Died | Bishop Emeritus of Antioquía, Colombia |
(WikiData: Q64734759)
Bishop
Guillermo
Escobar Vélez
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus
of Antioquía
|
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | La Estrella |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠