Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
11 Dec 1860 | Born | ||
Sep 1883 | 22.7 | Professed | Member of La Société des Missions Etrangères |
5 Jul 1885 | 24.5 | Ordained Priest | Priest of La Société des Missions Etrangères |
12 Aug 1910 | 49.6 | Appointed | Vicar Apostolic of Kienchang, China |
12 Aug 1910 | 49.6 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro |
20 Nov 1910 | 49.9 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro |
28 Apr 1916 | 55.3 | Appointed | Vicar Apostolic of Canton [Guangzhou], China |
1921 | 60.0 | Resigned | Vicar Apostolic of Canton [Guangzhou], China |
21 Mar 1921 | 60.2 | Appointed | Superior General of La Société des Missions Etrangères |
10 Dec 1921 | 60.9 | Appointed | Titular Archbishop of Marcianopolis |
6 Mar 1935 | 74.2 | Died | Superior General of La Société des Missions Etrangères |
(VIAF: 92941810; WikiData: Q3171022)
Archbishop
Jean-Baptiste-Marie
Budes de Guébriant
M.E.P.
(born , died )
Superior General
of La Société des Missions Etrangères
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France |
Ordained Bishop | Suifu |
Death Place | Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries | Religious
Men
Women |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 27 Aug 2024 |
✠