Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
23 Jul 1913 | Born | ||
17 Dec 1938 | 25.4 | Ordained Deacon | Deacon of Fukuoka, Japan |
29 Jun 1939 | 25.9 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Fukuoka, Japan |
1940¹ | 26.4 | Entered | Priest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice |
22 Dec 1961 | 48.4 | Appointed | Bishop of Oita, Japan |
26 Mar 1962 | 48.6 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop of Oita, Japan |
15 Nov 1969 | 56.3 | Appointed | Bishop of Fukuoka, Japan |
23 Jan 1970 | 56.5 | Installed | Bishop of Fukuoka, Japan |
6 Oct 1990 | 77.2 | Retired | Bishop of Fukuoka, Japan |
5 Aug 2007 | 94.0 | Died | Bishop Emeritus of Fukuoka, Japan |
|
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Kitano-Machi |
Ordained Deacon | Saint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France |
Ordained Priest | Notre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France |
Ordained Bishop | Oïta, Diocese of Oita |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠