Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
8 Jun 1872 | Born | ||
10 Aug 1897 | 25.1 | Ordained Priest | Priest |
20 Dec 1935 | 63.5 | Appointed | Secretary of the Apostolic Signatura |
14 Dec 1959 | 87.5 | Elevated to Cardinal | |
14 Dec 1959 | 87.5 | Appointed | Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano |
5 Apr 1962 | 89.8 | Appointed | Titular Archbishop of Fallaba |
19 Apr 1962 | 89.8 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Archbishop of Fallaba |
19 Apr 1962 | 89.8 | Resigned | Titular Archbishop of Fallaba |
12 Jul 1968 | 96.0 | Died | Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano |
(VIAF: 88954472; WikiData: Q1348908)
Francesco
Cardinal
Morano
(born , died )
Cardinal-Deacon
of Santi Cosma e Damiano
|
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Caïvano, Italy |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠