Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
2 Jul 1902 | Born | ||
28 Jun 1925 | 22.9 | Ordained Priest | Priest |
27 Mar 1951 | 48.7 | Appointed | Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy |
27 May 1951 | 48.9 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy |
6 Sep 1966 | 64.1 | Resigned | Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy |
6 Sep 1966 | 64.1 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Gunugus |
6 Sep 1966 | 64.1 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Udine, Italy |
21 Mar 1974 | 71.7 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Iulium Carnicum |
31 May 1985 | 82.9 | Resigned | Auxiliary Bishop of Udine, Italy |
1 Aug 1985 | 83.0 | Resigned | Titular Bishop of Iulium Carnicum |
5 Apr 1994 | 91.7 | Died | Bishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy |
(WikiData: Q20521073)
Bishop
Emilio
Pizzoni
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus
of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze
|
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Orsaria |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 25 Apr 2024 |
✠