Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
20 Jan 1915 | Born | ||
25 Jul 1937 | 22.5 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Order of the Minims |
19 Mar 1962 | 47.1 | Appointed | Prelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy |
19 Mar 1962 | 47.1 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Livias |
20 May 1962 | 47.3 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Livias |
21 Oct 1972 | 57.7 | Appointed | Bishop of Gerace-Locri (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy |
22 Sep 1988 | 73.6 | Resigned | Bishop of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy |
17 Nov 1988 | 73.8 | Died | Bishop Emeritus of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy |
(VIAF: 89735806; WikiData: Q47451013)
Bishop
Francesco
Tortora
O.M.
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus
of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi)
|
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Trecase |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠