Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
25 Mar 1964 | Born | ||
22 May 1992 | 28.1 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Wollongong, Australia |
20 Apr 2011 | 47.0 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia |
20 Apr 2011 | 47.0 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Tigisi in Numidia |
8 Jun 2011 | 47.2 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Tigisi in Numidia |
27 Feb 2014 | 49.9 | Appointed | Apostolic Administrator of Sydney, Australia |
12 Nov 2014 | 50.6 | Ceased | Apostolic Administrator of Sydney, Australia |
20 Nov 2014 | 50.6 | Appointed | Bishop of Broken Bay, Australia |
12 Dec 2014 | 50.7 | Installed | Bishop of Broken Bay, Australia |
29 Jun 2018 | 54.2 | Appointed | Archbishop of Melbourne, Australia |
1 Aug 2018 | 54.3 | Installed | Archbishop of Melbourne, Australia |
(VIAF: 4892145857052022920892; WikiData: Q1329203)
Archbishop
Peter Andrew
Comensoli
(born )
Archbishop
of Melbourne
|
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Bulli, New South Wales |
Ordained Bishop | Saint Mary, Cathedral, Sydney, Archdiocese of Sydney |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries | Religious
Men
Women |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 15 Aug 2024 |
✠