Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
14 Sep 1915 | Born | ||
8 Oct 1939 | 24.0 | Ordained Priest | Priest |
30 Apr 1962 | 46.6 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France |
30 Apr 1962 | 46.6 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Uthina |
19 Jun 1962 | 46.7 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Uthina |
3 Aug 1965 | 49.8 | Appointed | Bishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France |
15 Oct 1988 | 73.0 | Resigned | Bishop of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France |
11 Aug 2001 | 85.9 | Died | Bishop Emeritus of Périgueux (-Sarlat), France |
(WikiData: Q18626103)
Bishop
Jacques-Julien-Émile
Patria
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus
of Périgueux (-Sarlat)
|
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Fontaine-Chaâlis |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠